|
06/08/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 77, NAYS 39
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Amendment 489767 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 21 NAYS 16
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (726208)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 11 NAYS 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
CS/CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
CS/CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 5 NAYS 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 02/08/22, 12:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Ethics and Elections
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Ethics and Elections; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 4 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/24/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
11/30/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|