Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1078 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022
Bill January 25, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022