Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 893
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/HB 893
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Retained on Special Order Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/16/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/01/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|