Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1120 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 1, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 25, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022