Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | CS/CS by Finance and Tax read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | CS/CS by Finance and Tax; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/10/22, 11:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | CS by Commerce and Tourism read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | CS by Commerce and Tourism; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Commerce and Tourism, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/02/2021 | Filed |