Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1146 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 10, 2022
Bill February 1, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022