Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 01/27/22, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Now in Finance and Tax | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/02/2021 | Filed |