Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1150 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 2, 2021

Analysis

Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 20, 2022