Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/07/2022 | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 7 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | Now in Judiciary | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | CS by Health Policy read 1st time | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | CS by Health Policy; YEAS 6 NAYS 3 | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/07/2021 | Filed |