Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1184 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2022