Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 909
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 909
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Now in Agriculture
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Agriculture; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/09/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|