Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1210 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2022