Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/15/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|