Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1274 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022