Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 749
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted CS/CS/CS/HB 749
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/02/22, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/16/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|