Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1292 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 16, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill January 19, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022