Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/01/22, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Criminal Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
CS by Regulated Industries read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
CS by Regulated Industries; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/18/22, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Criminal Justice; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/17/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|