Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1302 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill January 19, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022