Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 92, NAYS 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 35 NAYS 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 15 NAYS 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/23/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/22, 8:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Judiciary read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
CS by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/17/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|