Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1304 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 17, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022