Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/09/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/08/2022 | Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/03/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Community Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/28/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/02/22, 11:00 am, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Community Affairs; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/20/2021 | Filed |