Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1314 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022