House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 02/01/22, 10:30 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|