Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1358 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022