|
04/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-66
|
|
|
|
04/07/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 116, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 36 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Favorable by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/01/22, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/22/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|