Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1360 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022