|
06/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-171
|
|
|
|
06/07/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Concurred in 1 amendment(s) (008505)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment 008505 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted for CS/HB 219
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (512422, 867456, 927158)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
CS by Rules read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Community Affairs; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/08/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Community Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary; Community Affairs; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
12/28/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|