Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1380 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2021

Engrossed

Bill March 8, 2022
Bill February 23, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 4, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 16, 2022