Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/16/2022 | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; YEAS 7 NAYS 1 | ||
Senate | 02/11/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Education, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | CS by Education read 1st time | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | CS by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Education, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 12/29/2021 | Filed |