Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1386 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 29, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 2, 2022