House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Passed as amended; YEAS 28 NAYS 8 590
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (906044)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Retained on Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/04/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/09/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 01/26/22, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/19/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 01/18/22, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Banking and Insurance; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/03/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|