Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1402 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 2, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 10, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022