Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1452 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2022