Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1526 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2022