|
04/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-38
|
|
|
|
04/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/29/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 113, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported out of Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2022
|
Added to Education & Employment Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Now in Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Education & Employment Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/15/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Now in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Education; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Education, 01/25/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Education; Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/05/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|