Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1552 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 6, 2022

Analysis

Analysis April 8, 2022
Analysis March 25, 2022
Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 27, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022