Senate | 03/14/2022 | Died in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Now in Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/22/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Favorable by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 | ||
Senate | 01/26/2022 | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Introduced | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations | ||
Senate | 01/05/2022 | Filed |