Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1562 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022