Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7055
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 7055
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Remaining references corrected to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Original reference(s) removed: Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/09/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
CS by Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; YEAS 6 NAYS 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security, 02/08/22, 12:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Military and Veterans Affairs, Space, and Domestic Security; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|