Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1670 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 6, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022