|
06/09/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 110, NAYS 8
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/8/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (577230)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/21/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable by Regulated Industries; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Regulated Industries, 01/25/22, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Regulated Industries; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|