Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1764 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 23, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022