Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/16/22, 1:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable by Agriculture; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/14/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/19/22, 8:30 am, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Agriculture; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|