Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1832 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022