|
04/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-41
|
|
|
|
04/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 117, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (302042)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/01/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 19 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/24/22, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/03/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/07/22, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
CS by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 02/01/22, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; Judiciary; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/07/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|