Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1844 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 7, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2022