Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/HB 7053
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Substituted CS/HB 7053
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 02/22/22, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/31/22, 3:00 pm, 37 Senate Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|