Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1940 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 1, 2022