|
04/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-42
|
|
|
|
04/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
04/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Ordered engrossed, then enrolled
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 115, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Amendment 967698 Concur
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Added to Senate Message List
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Concurred in House amendment(s) as amended (739505)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Amendment(s) to House amendment(s) adopted (967698)
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
In returning messages
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 77, NAYS 38
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment 739505 adopted
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Amendment 207883 Failed
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
1st Reading (Engrossed 1)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/7/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
CS passed as amended; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Amendment(s) adopted (594018)
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/03/22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/28/22, 10:30 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/18/2022
|
Now in Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Subcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 11 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/16/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
CS by Health Policy read 1st time
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
CS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/21/2022
|
On Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/26/22, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Introduced
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/12/2022
|
Referred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Filed
|
|
|