Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida Senate Bill S1950 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill March 11, 2022
Bill March 3, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 11, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 9, 2022
Analysis March 2, 2022
Analysis February 25, 2022
Analysis February 18, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 2, 2022
Bill January 26, 2022